Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 28 of 28
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Calandra, Paul | Conservative | Oak Ridges—Markham | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Calkins, Blaine | Conservative | Wetaskiwin | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Cannan, Hon. Ron | Conservative | Kelowna—Lake Country | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Carmichael, John | Conservative | Don Valley West | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Caron, Guy | NDP | Rimouski-Neigette—Témiscouata—Les Basques | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Carrie, Colin | Conservative | Oshawa | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Casey, Sean | Liberal | Charlottetown | Prince Edward Island | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Cash, Andrew | NDP | Davenport | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Chan, Arnold | Liberal | Scarborough—Agincourt | Ontario | Monday, June 30, 2014 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Charlton, Chris | NDP | Hamilton Mountain | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Chicoine, Sylvain | NDP | Châteauguay—Saint-Constant | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Chisholm, Robert | NDP | Dartmouth—Cole Harbour | Nova Scotia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Chisu, Corneliu | Conservative | Pickering—Scarborough East | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Chong, Hon. Michael D. | Conservative | Wellington—Halton Hills | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Choquette, François | NDP | Drummond | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Chow, Olivia | NDP | Trinity—Spadina | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Wednesday, March 12, 2014 |
Christopherson, David | NDP | Hamilton Centre | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Clarke, Rob | Conservative | Desnethé—Missinippi—Churchill River | Saskatchewan | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Cleary, Ryan | NDP | St. John's South—Mount Pearl | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Clement, Hon. Tony | Conservative | Parry Sound—Muskoka | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Coderre, Hon. Denis | Liberal | Bourassa | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, June 2, 2013 |
Comartin, Joe | NDP | Windsor—Tecumseh | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Côté, Raymond | NDP | Beauport—Limoilou | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Cotler, Hon. Irwin | Liberal | Mount Royal | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Crockatt, Joan | Conservative | Calgary Centre | Alberta | Monday, November 26, 2012 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Crowder, Jean | NDP | Nanaimo—Cowichan | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Cullen, Nathan | NDP | Skeena—Bulkley Valley | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Cuzner, Rodger | Liberal | Cape Breton—Canso | Nova Scotia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.