Members of the 39th Parliament
(Monday, April 3, 2006 to Sunday, September 7, 2008)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 27 of 27
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Calkins, Blaine | Conservative | Wetaskiwin | Alberta | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Cannan, Hon. Ron | Conservative | Kelowna—Lake Country | British Columbia | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Cannis, John | Liberal | Scarborough Centre | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Cannon, Hon. Lawrence | Conservative | Pontiac | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Cardin, Serge | Bloc Québécois | Sherbrooke | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Carrie, Colin | Conservative | Oshawa | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Carrier, Robert | Bloc Québécois | Alfred-Pellan | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Casey, Bill | Independent | Cumberland—Colchester—Musquodoboit Valley | Nova Scotia | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Casson, Hon. Rick | Conservative | Lethbridge | Alberta | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Chamberlain, Hon. Brenda | Liberal | Guelph | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, April 7, 2008 |
Chan, Hon. Raymond | Liberal | Richmond | British Columbia | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Charlton, Chris | NDP | Hamilton Mountain | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Chong, Hon. Michael D. | Conservative | Wellington—Halton Hills | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Chow, Olivia | NDP | Trinity—Spadina | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Christopherson, David | NDP | Hamilton Centre | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Clarke, Rob | Conservative | Desnethé—Missinippi—Churchill River | Saskatchewan | Monday, March 17, 2008 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Clement, Hon. Tony | Conservative | Parry Sound—Muskoka | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Coderre, Hon. Denis | Liberal | Bourassa | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Comartin, Joe | NDP | Windsor—Tecumseh | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Comuzzi, Hon. Joe | Conservative | Thunder Bay—Superior North | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Cotler, Hon. Irwin | Liberal | Mount Royal | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Crête, Paul | Bloc Québécois | Montmagny—L'Islet—Kamouraska—Rivière-du-Loup | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Crowder, Jean | NDP | Nanaimo—Cowichan | British Columbia | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Cullen, Nathan | NDP | Skeena—Bulkley Valley | British Columbia | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Cullen, Hon. Roy | Liberal | Etobicoke North | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Cummins, John | Conservative | Delta—Richmond East | British Columbia | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Cuzner, Rodger | Liberal | Cape Breton—Canso | Nova Scotia | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.