Members of the 37th Parliament
(Monday, January 29, 2001 to Sunday, May 23, 2004)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 28 of 28
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caccia, Hon. Charles L. | Liberal | Davenport | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Cadman, Chuck | Conservative | Surrey North | British Columbia | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Calder, Murray | Liberal | Dufferin—Peel—Wellington—Grey | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Cannis, John | Liberal | Scarborough Centre | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Caplan, Hon. Elinor | Liberal | Thornhill | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Cardin, Serge | Bloc Québécois | Sherbrooke | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Carignan, Jean-Guy | Independent | Québec Est | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Carroll, Hon. Aileen | Liberal | Barrie—Simcoe—Bradford | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Casey, Bill | Conservative | Cumberland—Colchester | Nova Scotia | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Casson, Hon. Rick | Conservative | Lethbridge | Alberta | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Castonguay, Jeannot | Liberal | Madawaska—Restigouche | New Brunswick | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Catterall, Marlene | Liberal | Ottawa West—Nepean | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Cauchon, Hon. Martin | Liberal | Outremont | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Chamberlain, Hon. Brenda | Liberal | Guelph—Wellington | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Charbonneau, Hon. Yvon | Liberal | Anjou—Rivière-des-Prairies | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Chatters, David | Conservative | Athabasca | Alberta | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Chrétien, Right Hon. Jean | Liberal | Saint-Maurice | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Friday, December 12, 2003 |
Clark, Right Hon. Joe | PC | Calgary Centre | Alberta | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Coderre, Hon. Denis | Liberal | Bourassa | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Collenette, Hon. David | Liberal | Don Valley East | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Comartin, Joe | NDP | Windsor—St. Clair | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Comuzzi, Hon. Joe | Liberal | Thunder Bay—Superior North | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Copps, Hon. Sheila | Liberal | Hamilton East | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Cotler, Hon. Irwin | Liberal | Mount Royal | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Crête, Paul | Bloc Québécois | Kamouraska—Rivière-du-Loup—Témiscouata—Les Basques | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Cullen, Hon. Roy | Liberal | Etobicoke North | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Cummins, John | Conservative | Delta—South Richmond | British Columbia | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Cuzner, Rodger | Liberal | Bras d'Or—Cape Breton | Nova Scotia | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.