Members of the 39th Parliament
(Monday, April 3, 2006 to Sunday, September 7, 2008)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 38 of 38
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bachand, Claude | Bloc Québécois | Saint-Jean | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Bagnell, Hon. Larry | Liberal | Yukon | Yukon | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Bains, Hon. Navdeep | Liberal | Mississauga—Brampton South | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Baird, Hon. John | Conservative | Ottawa West—Nepean | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Barbot, Vivian | Bloc Québécois | Papineau | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Barnes, Hon. Sue | Liberal | London West | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Batters, Dave | Conservative | Palliser | Saskatchewan | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Beaumier, Colleen | Liberal | Brampton West | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Bélanger, Hon. Mauril | Liberal | Ottawa—Vanier | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Bell, Catherine | NDP | Vancouver Island North | British Columbia | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Bell, Don H. | Liberal | North Vancouver | British Columbia | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Bellavance, André | Bloc Québécois | Richmond—Arthabaska | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Bennett, Hon. Carolyn | Liberal | St. Paul's | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Benoit, Leon | Conservative | Vegreville—Wainwright | Alberta | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Bernier, Hon. Maxime | Conservative | Beauce | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Bevilacqua, Hon. Maurizio | Liberal | Vaughan | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Bevington, Dennis | NDP | Western Arctic | Northwest Territories | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Bezan, James | Conservative | Selkirk—Interlake | Manitoba | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Bigras, Bernard | Bloc Québécois | Rosemont—La Petite-Patrie | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Black, Dawn | NDP | New Westminster—Coquitlam | British Columbia | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Blackburn, Hon. Jean-Pierre | Conservative | Jonquière—Alma | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Blaikie, Hon. Bill | NDP | Elmwood—Transcona | Manitoba | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Blais, Raynald | Bloc Québécois | Gaspésie—Îles-de-la-Madeleine | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Blaney, Hon. Steven | Conservative | Lévis—Bellechasse | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Bonin, Raymond | Liberal | Nickel Belt | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Bonsant, France | Bloc Québécois | Compton—Stanstead | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Boshcoff, Ken | Liberal | Thunder Bay—Rainy River | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Bouchard, Robert | Bloc Québécois | Chicoutimi—Le Fjord | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Boucher, Sylvie | Conservative | Beauport—Limoilou | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Bourgeois, Diane | Bloc Québécois | Terrebonne—Blainville | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Breitkreuz, Garry | Conservative | Yorkton—Melville | Saskatchewan | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Brison, Hon. Scott | Liberal | Kings—Hants | Nova Scotia | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Brown, Bonnie | Liberal | Oakville | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Brown, Gordon | Conservative | Leeds—Grenville | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Brown, Patrick | Conservative | Barrie | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Bruinooge, Rod | Conservative | Winnipeg South | Manitoba | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Brunelle, Paule | Bloc Québécois | Trois-Rivières | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Byrne, Hon. Gerry | Liberal | Humber—St. Barbe—Baie Verte | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.