Members of the 36th Parliament
(Monday, September 22, 1997 to Sunday, October 22, 2000)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 23 of 23
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anders, Rob | Canadian Alliance | Calgary West | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Benoit, Leon | Canadian Alliance | Lakeland | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Breitkreuz, Cliff | Canadian Alliance | Yellowhead | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Casson, Hon. Rick | Canadian Alliance | Lethbridge | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Chatters, David | Canadian Alliance | Athabasca | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Epp, Ken | Canadian Alliance | Elk Island | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Goldring, Peter | Canadian Alliance | Edmonton Centre-East | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Hanger, Art | Canadian Alliance | Calgary Northeast | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Hill, Hon. Grant | Canadian Alliance | Macleod | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Jaffer, Rahim | Canadian Alliance | Edmonton—Strathcona | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Johnston, Dale | Canadian Alliance | Wetaskiwin | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Kenney, Hon. Jason | Canadian Alliance | Calgary Southeast | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Kilgour, Hon. David | Liberal | Edmonton Southeast | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Lowther, Eric | Canadian Alliance | Calgary Centre | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Manning, Preston | Canadian Alliance | Calgary Southwest | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
McClelland, Ian | Canadian Alliance | Edmonton Southwest | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Mills, Bob | Canadian Alliance | Red Deer | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Obhrai, Deepak | Canadian Alliance | Calgary East | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Penson, Charlie | Canadian Alliance | Peace River | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Ramsay, Jack | Ind. CA | Crowfoot | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Solberg, Hon. Monte | Canadian Alliance | Medicine Hat | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Thompson, Myron | Canadian Alliance | Wild Rose | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Williams, John G. | Canadian Alliance | St. Albert | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.