Members of the 42nd Parliament
(Thursday, December 3, 2015 to Wednesday, September 11, 2019)
Refine your search
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ashton, Niki | NDP | Churchill—Keewatinook Aski | Manitoba | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Bergen, Hon. Candice | Conservative | Portage—Lisgar | Manitoba | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Mihychuk, Hon. MaryAnn | Liberal | Kildonan—St. Paul | Manitoba | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.