Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 5 of 5
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ablonczy, Hon. Diane | Conservative | Calgary—Nose Hill | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Ambrose, Hon. Rona | Conservative | Edmonton—Spruce Grove | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Crockatt, Joan | Conservative | Calgary Centre | Alberta | Monday, November 26, 2012 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Duncan, Linda | NDP | Edmonton—Strathcona | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Rempel, Hon. Michelle | Conservative | Calgary Centre-North | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.