Members of the 40th Parliament
(Tuesday, November 18, 2008 to Saturday, March 26, 2011)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 6 of 6
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ashton, Niki | NDP | Churchill | Manitoba | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Glover, Shelly | Conservative | Saint Boniface | Manitoba | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Hoeppner, Candice | Conservative | Portage—Lisgar | Manitoba | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Neville, Hon. Anita | Liberal | Winnipeg South Centre | Manitoba | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Smith, Joy | Conservative | Kildonan—St. Paul | Manitoba | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Wasylycia-Leis, Judy | NDP | Winnipeg North | Manitoba | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Friday, April 30, 2010 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.