Members of the 42nd Parliament
(Thursday, December 3, 2015 to Wednesday, September 11, 2019)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 10 of 10
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Albas, Dan | Conservative | Central Okanagan—Similkameen—Nicola | British Columbia | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Arnold, Mel | Conservative | North Okanagan—Shuswap | British Columbia | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Doherty, Todd | Conservative | Cariboo—Prince George | British Columbia | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Fast, Hon. Ed | Conservative | Abbotsford | British Columbia | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
McLeod, Cathy | Conservative | Kamloops—Thompson—Cariboo | British Columbia | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Strahl, Mark | Conservative | Chilliwack—Hope | British Columbia | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Warawa, Mark | Conservative | Langley—Aldergrove | British Columbia | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Thursday, June 20, 2019 |
Watts, Dianne L. | Conservative | South Surrey—White Rock | British Columbia | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Friday, September 29, 2017 |
Wong, Hon. Alice | Conservative | Richmond Centre | British Columbia | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Zimmer, Bob | Conservative | Prince George—Peace River—Northern Rockies | British Columbia | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.