Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 4 of 4
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Armstrong, Scott | Conservative | Cumberland—Colchester—Musquodoboit Valley | Nova Scotia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Keddy, Gerald | Conservative | South Shore—St. Margaret's | Nova Scotia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Kerr, Greg | Conservative | West Nova | Nova Scotia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
MacKay, Hon. Peter Gordon | Conservative | Central Nova | Nova Scotia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.