Members of the 40th Parliament
(Tuesday, November 18, 2008 to Saturday, March 26, 2011)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 10 of 10
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bezan, James | Conservative | Selkirk—Interlake | Manitoba | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Bruinooge, Rod | Conservative | Winnipeg South | Manitoba | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Fletcher, Hon. Steven | Conservative | Charleswood—St. James—Assiniboia | Manitoba | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Glover, Shelly | Conservative | Saint Boniface | Manitoba | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Hoeppner, Candice | Conservative | Portage—Lisgar | Manitoba | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Mark, Inky | Conservative | Dauphin—Swan River—Marquette | Manitoba | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Wednesday, September 15, 2010 |
Smith, Joy | Conservative | Kildonan—St. Paul | Manitoba | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Sopuck, Robert | Conservative | Dauphin—Swan River—Marquette | Manitoba | Monday, November 29, 2010 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Toews, Hon. Vic | Conservative | Provencher | Manitoba | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Tweed, Merv | Conservative | Brandon—Souris | Manitoba | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.