Members of the 39th Parliament
(Monday, April 3, 2006 to Sunday, September 7, 2008)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 8 of 8
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bezan, James | Conservative | Selkirk—Interlake | Manitoba | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Bruinooge, Rod | Conservative | Winnipeg South | Manitoba | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Fletcher, Hon. Steven | Conservative | Charleswood—St. James—Assiniboia | Manitoba | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Mark, Inky | Conservative | Dauphin—Swan River—Marquette | Manitoba | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Pallister, Brian | Conservative | Portage—Lisgar | Manitoba | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Smith, Joy | Conservative | Kildonan—St. Paul | Manitoba | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Toews, Hon. Vic | Conservative | Provencher | Manitoba | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Tweed, Merv | Conservative | Brandon—Souris | Manitoba | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.