Members of the 42nd Parliament
(Thursday, December 3, 2015 to Wednesday, September 11, 2019)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 8 of 8
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caesar-Chavannes, Celina | Independent | Whitby | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Clement, Hon. Tony | Independent | Parry Sound—Muskoka | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Grewal, Raj | Independent | Brampton East | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Kang, Darshan Singh | Independent | Calgary Skyview | Alberta | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Nantel, Pierre | Independent | Longueuil—Saint-Hubert | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Philpott, Hon. Jane | Independent | Markham—Stouffville | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Tootoo, Hon. Hunter | Independent | Nunavut | Nunavut | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Wilson-Raybould, Hon. Jody | Independent | Vancouver Granville | British Columbia | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.