Members of the 37th Parliament
(Monday, January 29, 2001 to Sunday, May 23, 2004)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 7 of 7
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bachand, André | Independent | Richmond—Arthabaska | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Brien, Pierre | Independent | Témiscamingue | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Friday, March 14, 2003 |
Carignan, Jean-Guy | Independent | Québec Est | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Lebel, Ghislain | Independent | Chambly | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Martin, Hon. Keith | Independent | Esquimalt—Juan de Fuca | British Columbia | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Pankiw, Jim | Independent | Saskatoon—Humboldt | Saskatchewan | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Spencer, Larry | Independent | Regina—Lumsden—Lake Centre | Saskatchewan | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.