Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hassainia, Sana | Independent | Verchères—Les Patriotes | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Mourani, Maria | Independent | Ahuntsic | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Perreault, Manon | Independent | Montcalm | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.