Members of the 42nd Parliament
(Thursday, December 3, 2015 to Wednesday, September 11, 2019)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 10 of 10
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barsalou-Duval, Xavier | Bloc Québécois | Pierre-Boucher—Les Patriotes—Verchères | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Beaulieu, Mario | Bloc Québécois | La Pointe-de-l'Île | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Boudrias, Michel | Bloc Québécois | Terrebonne | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Fortin, Rhéal Éloi | Bloc Québécois | Rivière-du-Nord | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Gill, Marilène | Bloc Québécois | Manicouagan | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Marcil, Simon | Bloc Québécois | Mirabel | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Pauzé, Monique | Bloc Québécois | Repentigny | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Plamondon, Louis | Bloc Québécois | Bécancour—Nicolet—Saurel | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Ste-Marie, Gabriel | Bloc Québécois | Joliette | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Thériault, Luc | Bloc Québécois | Montcalm | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.