Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 39 of 39
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adams, Eve | Liberal | Mississauga—Brampton South | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Bélanger, Hon. Mauril | Liberal | Ottawa—Vanier | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Bennett, Hon. Carolyn | Liberal | St. Paul's | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Brison, Hon. Scott | Liberal | Kings—Hants | Nova Scotia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Byrne, Hon. Gerry | Liberal | Humber—St. Barbe—Baie Verte | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Casey, Sean | Liberal | Charlottetown | Prince Edward Island | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Chan, Arnold | Liberal | Scarborough—Agincourt | Ontario | Monday, June 30, 2014 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Coderre, Hon. Denis | Liberal | Bourassa | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, June 2, 2013 |
Cotler, Hon. Irwin | Liberal | Mount Royal | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Cuzner, Rodger | Liberal | Cape Breton—Canso | Nova Scotia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Dion, Hon. Stéphane | Liberal | Saint-Laurent—Cartierville | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Dubourg, Emmanuel | Liberal | Bourassa | Quebec | Monday, November 25, 2013 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Duncan, Hon. Kirsty | Liberal | Etobicoke North | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Easter, Hon. Wayne | Liberal | Malpeque | Prince Edward Island | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Eyking, Hon. Mark | Liberal | Sydney—Victoria | Nova Scotia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Foote, Hon. Judy | Liberal | Random—Burin—St. George's | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Freeland, Hon. Chrystia | Liberal | Toronto Centre | Ontario | Monday, November 25, 2013 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Fry, Hon. Hedy | Liberal | Vancouver Centre | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Garneau, Hon. Marc | Liberal | Westmount—Ville-Marie | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Goodale, Hon. Ralph | Liberal | Wascana | Saskatchewan | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Hsu, Ted | Liberal | Kingston and the Islands | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Jones, Yvonne | Liberal | Labrador | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, May 13, 2013 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Karygiannis, Hon. Jim | Liberal | Scarborough—Agincourt | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Tuesday, April 1, 2014 |
Lamoureux, Kevin | Liberal | Winnipeg North | Manitoba | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
LeBlanc, Hon. Dominic | Liberal | Beauséjour | New Brunswick | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
MacAulay, Hon. Lawrence | Liberal | Cardigan | Prince Edward Island | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
McCallum, Hon. John | Liberal | Markham—Unionville | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
McGuinty, David J. | Liberal | Ottawa South | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
McKay, Hon. John | Liberal | Scarborough—Guildwood | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Murray, Joyce | Liberal | Vancouver Quadra | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Rae, Hon. Bob | Liberal | Toronto Centre | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Wednesday, July 31, 2013 |
Regan, Hon. Geoff | Liberal | Halifax West | Nova Scotia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Scarpaleggia, Francis | Liberal | Lac-Saint-Louis | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Sgro, Hon. Judy A. | Liberal | York West | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Simms, Scott | Liberal | Bonavista—Gander—Grand Falls—Windsor | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
St-Denis, Lise | Liberal | Saint-Maurice—Champlain | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Trudeau, Right Hon. Justin | Liberal | Papineau | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Valeriote, Frank | Liberal | Guelph | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Vaughan, Adam | Liberal | Trinity—Spadina | Ontario | Monday, June 30, 2014 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.