Members of the 39th Parliament
(Monday, April 3, 2006 to Sunday, September 7, 2008)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 13 of 13
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Coderre, Hon. Denis | Liberal | Bourassa | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Cotler, Hon. Irwin | Liberal | Mount Royal | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Dion, Hon. Stéphane | Liberal | Saint-Laurent—Cartierville | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Folco, Raymonde | Liberal | Laval—Les Îles | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Jennings, Hon. Marlene | Liberal | Notre-Dame-de-Grâce—Lachine | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Lapierre, Hon. Jean C. | Liberal | Outremont | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Sunday, January 28, 2007 |
Martin, Right Hon. Paul | Liberal | LaSalle—Émard | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Pacetti, Massimo | Liberal | Saint-Léonard—Saint-Michel | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Patry, Bernard | Liberal | Pierrefonds—Dollard | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Proulx, Marcel | Liberal | Hull—Aylmer | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Robillard, Hon. Lucienne | Liberal | Westmount—Ville-Marie | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Friday, January 25, 2008 |
Rodriguez, Pablo | Liberal | Honoré-Mercier | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Scarpaleggia, Francis | Liberal | Lac-Saint-Louis | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.