Members of the 39th Parliament
(Monday, April 3, 2006 to Sunday, September 7, 2008)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 8 of 8
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bell, Don H. | Liberal | North Vancouver | British Columbia | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Chan, Hon. Raymond | Liberal | Richmond | British Columbia | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Dhaliwal, Sukh | Liberal | Newton—North Delta | British Columbia | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Dosanjh, Hon. Ujjal | Liberal | Vancouver South | British Columbia | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Fry, Hon. Hedy | Liberal | Vancouver Centre | British Columbia | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Martin, Hon. Keith | Liberal | Esquimalt—Juan de Fuca | British Columbia | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Murray, Joyce | Liberal | Vancouver Quadra | British Columbia | Monday, March 17, 2008 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Owen, Hon. Stephen | Liberal | Vancouver Quadra | British Columbia | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Friday, July 27, 2007 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.