Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Del Mastro, Dean | Conservative Independent | Peterborough | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Wednesday, November 5, 2014 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.