Members of the 36th Parliament
(Monday, September 22, 1997 to Sunday, October 22, 2000)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 25 of 25
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abbott, Hon. Jim | Canadian Alliance | Kootenay—Columbia | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Cadman, Chuck | Canadian Alliance | Surrey North | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Cummins, John | Canadian Alliance | Delta—South Richmond | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Day, Hon. Stockwell | Canadian Alliance | Okanagan—Coquihalla | British Columbia | Monday, September 11, 2000 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Duncan, Hon. John | Canadian Alliance | Vancouver Island North | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Elley, Reed | Canadian Alliance | Nanaimo—Cowichan | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Forseth, Paul | Canadian Alliance | New Westminster—Coquitlam—Burnaby | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Gilmour, Bill | Canadian Alliance | Nanaimo—Alberni | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Gouk, Jim | Canadian Alliance | Kootenay—Boundary—Okanagan | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Grewal, Gurmant | Canadian Alliance | Surrey Central | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Harris, Richard M. | Canadian Alliance | Prince George—Bulkley Valley | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Hart, Jim | Canadian Alliance | Okanagan—Coquihalla | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Wednesday, July 19, 2000 |
Hill, Hon. Jay | Canadian Alliance | Prince George—Peace River | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Lunn, Hon. Gary | Canadian Alliance | Saanich—Gulf Islands | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Martin, Hon. Keith | Canadian Alliance | Esquimalt—Juan de Fuca | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Mayfield, Philip | Canadian Alliance | Cariboo—Chilcotin | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
McNally, Grant | Canadian Alliance | Dewdney—Alouette | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Meredith, Val | Canadian Alliance | South Surrey—White Rock—Langley | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Reynolds, Hon. John | Canadian Alliance | West Vancouver—Sunshine Coast | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Schmidt, Werner | Canadian Alliance | Kelowna | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Scott, Mike | Canadian Alliance | Skeena | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Stinson, Darrel | Canadian Alliance | Okanagan—Shuswap | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Strahl, Hon. Chuck | Canadian Alliance | Fraser Valley | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
White, Randy | Canadian Alliance | Langley—Abbotsford | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
White, Ted | Canadian Alliance | North Vancouver | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.