Roles - Charlie Power
Current and Past
Member of Parliament
Constituency | Province / Territory | Start Date | End Date |
---|---|---|---|
St. John's West | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Monday, January 31, 2000 |
Committees
Parliament ‑ Session | Role | Committee | Start Date | End Date |
---|---|---|---|---|
36-2 | Member | Subcommittee on Aquaculture and Oceans Act of the Standing Committee on Fisheries and Oceans | Thursday, November 4, 1999 | Friday, March 3, 2000 |
36-1 | Member | Subcommittee on Agenda and procedure of the Standing Committee on Citizenship and Immigration | Monday, June 7, 1999 | Saturday, September 18, 1999 |
36-1 | Member | Citizenship and Immigration | Thursday, May 13, 1999 | Saturday, September 18, 1999 |
36-1 | Member | Subcommittee on Agenda and Procedure of the Standing Committee on Public Accounts | Thursday, October 1, 1998 | Saturday, September 18, 1999 |
36-1 | Member | Subcommittee on International Financial Reporting Guidelines and Standards for the Public Sector of the Standing Committee on Public Accounts | Thursday, March 25, 1999 | Thursday, May 13, 1999 |
36-1 | Member | Public Accounts | Wednesday, November 4, 1998 | Thursday, May 13, 1999 |
36-1 | Member | Subcommittee on Agenda and Procedure of the Standing Committee on Industry | Thursday, October 2, 1997 | Wednesday, February 25, 1998 |
36-1 | Member | Industry | Tuesday, September 30, 1997 | Wednesday, February 4, 1998 |
Election Candidate
Date | Election Type | Constituency | Province / Territory | Result |
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, June 2, 1997 | General Election | St. John's West | Newfoundland and Labrador | Elected |