NDDN Committee Report
If you have any questions or comments regarding the accessibility of this publication, please contact us at accessible@parl.gc.ca.
Associations and Individuals |
Date |
Meeting |
| |
| Department of National Defence General Raymond R. Henault, Chief of the Defence Staff |
20/10/2004 |
3 |
|
| Vice-Admiral Bruce MacLean, Chief of Maritime Staff |
|
|
|
| Department of National Defence Alan Williams, Assistant Deputy Minister, Materiel |
25/10/2004 |
4 |
|
| Captain(N) M.F. Williamson, Project Manager, Submarine Capability Life Extension |
|
|
|
| As Individual Vice-Admiral (Retired) Peter Cairns |
01/11/2004 |
6 |
|
| As Individuals Brigadier-General (Retired) Darrell Dean |
15/11/2004 |
8 |
|
| Ray Sturgeon |
|
|
|
| As Individuals Lieutenant-General (Retired) Robert Fischer |
22/11/2004 |
9 |
|
| Pierre Lagueux |
|
|
|
| As Individual Honorable Art Eggleton |
29/11/2004 |
11 |
|
| Department of National Defence Captain(B) M.F. Williamson, Project Manager, Submarine Capability Life Extension |
06/12/2004 |
13 |
|
| As Individual Gerry O’Keefe |
|
|
|
| As Individual Honorable David Collenette |
13/12/2004 |
15 |
|
| As Individual Peter T. Kavanaugh |
03/02/2005 |
17 |
|
| As Individual Professor Martin Shadwick |
10/02/2005 |
19 |
|
| As Individual Richard Gimblett |
15/02/2005 |
20 |
|
| Howard Peter Langille |
|
|
|
| Department of National Defence Alan Williams, Assistant Deputy Minister, Materiel |
17/02/2005 |
21 |
|
| Commodore Roger Westwood, Maritime Equipment Program Management |
|
|
|
| Federal Government Dockyard Trades and Labour Council (East) Dean Reid, President |
|
|
|
| Tom Denault, Vice-President |
|
|
|
| Lorne Brown, Recording Secretary |
|
|
|
| Brian Anthony, Treasurer |
|
|