HUMA Committee Report
If you have any questions or comments regarding the accessibility of this publication, please contact us at accessible@parl.gc.ca.
WITNESSES
Organization |
Appeared |
Meeting No |
Association of Canadian Community Colleges |
2001/04/03 |
18 |
Terry-Anne Boyles |
|
|
Vice-President |
|
|
Association of Universities and Colleges of Canada |
2001/04/03 |
18 |
Robert Best |
|
|
Director, Government Relations and Public Affairs |
|
|
BDP Business Data Service |
2001/04/03 |
18 |
Lawrence Zimmering |
|
|
President and CEO |
|
|
Canadian Alliance of Student Associations |
2001/04/03 |
18 |
Mark Kissel |
|
|
National Director |
|
|
Canadian Association of Student Financial Aid Administrators |
2001/04/03 |
18 |
Tony Norrad |
|
|
Member-at-Large |
|
|
Canadian Association of University Teachers |
2001/04/03 |
18 |
James Turk |
|
|
Executive Director |
|
|
Canadian Federation of Students |
2001/04/03 |
18 |
Michael Conlon |
|
|
National Chairperson |
|
|
Canadian Graduate Council |
2001/04/03 |
18 |
Brad Wuetherick |
|
|
Chair |
|
|
Department of Human Resources Development Canada |
2001/04/03 |
18 |
Thomas Townsend |
|
|
Director General |
|
|
Department of Human Resources Development Canada |
2001/04/03 |
18 |
Margaret Biggs |
|
|
Assistant Deputy Minister |
|
|
EDULINX Canada Corporation |
2001/04/03 |
18 |
Tom Mellish |
|
|
President and CEO |
|
|
Financial Arrangements Working Group |
2001/04/03 |
18 |
J.T.S. (Tom) Lumsden |
|
|
National Manager |
|
|
National Association of Career Colleges |
2001/04/03 |
18 |
Paul Kitchin |
|
|
Executive Director |
|
|
Canadian Centre for Policy Alternatives |
2001/05/17 |
27 |
Denise Doherty Delorme |
|
|
Research Associate |
|
|
Council of Ministers of Education (Canada) |
2001/05/17 |
27 |
Paul Cappon |
|
|
Director General |
|
|
Department of Human Resources Development Canada |
2001/05/17 |
27 |
Thomas Townsend |
|
|
Director General |
|
|
Natural Sciences and Engineering Research Council of Canada |
2001/05/17 |
27 |
Thomas Brzustowski |
|
|
President |
|
|
Statistics Canada |
2001/05/17 |
27 |
Ross Finnie |
|
|
Research Fellow and Adjunct Professor |
|
|
Statistics Canada |
2001/05/17 |
27 |
Scott Murray |
|
|
Director General |
|
|
University of Western Ontario |
2001/05/17 |
27 |
Paul Davenport |
|
|
President and Vice-Chancellor |
|
|
"Fédération québécoise des professeurs et professeures d'université" |
2001/05/29 |
28 |
Arpi Hamalian |
|
|
President |
|
|
Association of Community Colleges of Canada |
2001/05/29 |
28 |
Bill Conrod |
|
|
Retired Vice-President of Algonquin College and ACCC Senior |
|
|
Consultant |
|
|
Association of Universities and Colleges of Canada |
2001/05/29 |
28 |
Robert Giroux |
|
|
President |
|
|
Canadian Alliance of Student Associations |
2001/05/29 |
28 |
Liam Arbuckle |
|
|
National Director |
|
|
Canadian Association of University Teachers |
2001/05/29 |
28 |
James Turk |
|
|
Executive Director |
|
|
Canadian Federation of Students |
2001/05/29 |
28 |
Ian Boyko |
|
|
Chair |
|
|
Canadian Medical Association |
2001/05/29 |
28 |
William Easton |
|
|
Chair |
|
|
Canadian Nurses Association |
2001/05/29 |
28 |
Lucille Auffrey |
|
|
Executive Director |
|
|
National Education Association of Disabled Students |
2001/05/29 |
28 |
Frank Smith |
|
|
National Coordinator |
|
|
National Professional Association Coalition on Tuition |
2001/05/29 |
28 |
Claude Paul Boivin |
|
|
Spokesperson |
|
|
Building and Construction Trades Department |
2001/05/31 |
29 |
Robert Blakely |
|
|
Director of Canadian Affairs |
|
|
Canadian Apprenticeship Forum |
2001/05/31 |
29 |
Keith Lancastle |
|
|
Executive Director |
|
|
Canadian Automotive Repair and Service (CARS) Council |
2001/05/31 |
29 |
Jennifer Steeves |
|
|
Project Coordinator |
|
|
Department of Human Resources Development Canada |
2001/05/31 |
29 |
Don DeJong |
|
|
A/Director General |
|
|
Department of Human Resources Development Canada |
2001/05/31 |
29 |
David MacDonald |
|
|
Director General |
|
|
Software Human Resources Council (Canada) Inc. |
2001/05/31 |
29 |
Robyn Gordon |
|
|
Vice-President |
|
|
The Alliance of Sector Councils |
2001/05/31 |
29 |
Gary Grenman |
|
|
Executive Director |
|
|
The Canadian Council of Directors of Apprenticeship Training |
2001/05/31 |
29 |
Doug Muir |
|
|
Chair of the Industrial Relations Committee and Saskatchewan's |
|
|