Members of the 43rd Parliament
(Thursday, December 5, 2019 to Sunday, August 15, 2021)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 7 of 7
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harris, Jack | NDP | St. John's East | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, October 21, 2019 | Sunday, September 19, 2021 |
Hutchings, Gudie | Liberal | Long Range Mountains | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, October 21, 2019 | Sunday, September 19, 2021 |
Jones, Yvonne | Liberal | Labrador | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, October 21, 2019 | Sunday, September 19, 2021 |
McDonald, Ken | Liberal | Avalon | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, October 21, 2019 | Sunday, September 19, 2021 |
O'Regan, Hon. Seamus | Liberal | St. John's South—Mount Pearl | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, October 21, 2019 | Sunday, September 19, 2021 |
Rogers, Churence | Liberal | Bonavista—Burin—Trinity | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, October 21, 2019 | Sunday, September 19, 2021 |
Simms, Scott | Liberal | Coast of Bays—Central—Notre Dame | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, October 21, 2019 | Sunday, September 19, 2021 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.