Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 8 of 8
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrews, Scott | Independent | Avalon | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Byrne, Hon. Gerry | Liberal | Humber—St. Barbe—Baie Verte | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Cleary, Ryan | NDP | St. John's South—Mount Pearl | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Foote, Hon. Judy | Liberal | Random—Burin—St. George's | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Harris, Jack | NDP | St. John's East | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Jones, Yvonne | Liberal | Labrador | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, May 13, 2013 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Penashue, Hon. Peter | Conservative | Labrador | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Thursday, March 14, 2013 |
Simms, Scott | Liberal | Bonavista—Gander—Grand Falls—Windsor | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.