Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 10 of 10
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bradshaw, Hon. Claudette | Liberal | Moncton—Riverview—Dieppe | New Brunswick | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
D'Amours, Jean-Claude | Liberal | Madawaska—Restigouche | New Brunswick | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Godin, Yvon | NDP | Acadie—Bathurst | New Brunswick | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Hubbard, Hon. Charles | Liberal | Miramichi | New Brunswick | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
LeBlanc, Hon. Dominic | Liberal | Beauséjour | New Brunswick | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Moore, Hon. Rob | Conservative | Fundy Royal | New Brunswick | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Savoy, Andy | Liberal | Tobique—Mactaquac | New Brunswick | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Scott, Hon. Andy | Liberal | Fredericton | New Brunswick | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Thompson, Hon. Greg Francis | Conservative | New Brunswick Southwest | New Brunswick | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Zed, Paul | Liberal | Saint John | New Brunswick | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.