Members of the 36th Parliament
(Monday, September 22, 1997 to Sunday, October 22, 2000)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 4 of 4
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Easter, Hon. Wayne | Liberal | Malpeque | Prince Edward Island | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
MacAulay, Hon. Lawrence | Liberal | Cardigan | Prince Edward Island | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
McGuire, Hon. Joe | Liberal | Egmont | Prince Edward Island | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Proud, George | Liberal | Hillsborough | Prince Edward Island | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.