Members of the 36th Parliament
(Monday, September 22, 1997 to Sunday, October 22, 2000)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 10 of 10
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bernier, Gilles | PC | Tobique—Mactaquac | New Brunswick | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Bradshaw, Hon. Claudette | Liberal | Moncton—Riverview—Dieppe | New Brunswick | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Dubé, Jean | PC | Madawaska—Restigouche | New Brunswick | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Godin, Yvon | NDP | Acadie—Bathurst | New Brunswick | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Herron, John | PC | Fundy—Royal | New Brunswick | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Hubbard, Hon. Charles | Liberal | Miramichi | New Brunswick | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Scott, Hon. Andy | Liberal | Fredericton | New Brunswick | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Thompson, Hon. Greg Francis | PC | New Brunswick Southwest | New Brunswick | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Vautour, Angela | PC | Beauséjour—Petitcodiac | New Brunswick | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Wayne, Elsie | PC | Saint John | New Brunswick | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.