Members of the 39th Parliament
(Monday, April 3, 2006 to Sunday, September 7, 2008)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 10 of 10
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wallace, Mike | Conservative | Burlington | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Wappel, Tom | Liberal | Scarborough Southwest | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Warawa, Mark | Conservative | Langley | British Columbia | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Warkentin, Chris | Conservative | Peace River | Alberta | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Wasylycia-Leis, Judy | NDP | Winnipeg North | Manitoba | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Watson, Jeff | Conservative | Essex | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Wilfert, Hon. Bryon | Liberal | Richmond Hill | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Williams, John G. | Conservative | Edmonton—St. Albert | Alberta | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Wilson, Blair | Green Party | West Vancouver—Sunshine Coast—Sea to Sky Country | British Columbia | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Wrzesnewskyj, Borys | Liberal | Etobicoke Centre | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.