Members of the 36th Parliament
(Monday, September 22, 1997 to Sunday, October 22, 2000)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 6 of 6
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Valeri, Hon. Tony | Liberal | Stoney Creek | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Vanclief, Hon. Lyle | Liberal | Prince Edward—Hastings | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Vautour, Angela | PC | Beauséjour—Petitcodiac | New Brunswick | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Vellacott, Maurice | Canadian Alliance | Saskatoon—Wanuskewin | Saskatchewan | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Venne, Pierrette | Bloc Québécois | Saint-Bruno—Saint-Hubert | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Volpe, Hon. Joseph | Liberal | Eglinton—Lawrence | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.