Members of the 36th Parliament
(Monday, September 22, 1997 to Sunday, October 22, 2000)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 8 of 8
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Telegdi, Hon. Andrew | Liberal | Kitchener—Waterloo | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Thibeault, Yolande | Liberal | Saint-Lambert | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Thompson, Hon. Greg Francis | PC | New Brunswick Southwest | New Brunswick | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Thompson, Myron | Canadian Alliance | Wild Rose | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Torsney, Hon. Paddy | Liberal | Burlington | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Tremblay, Stéphan | Bloc Québécois | Lac-Saint-Jean—Saguenay | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Tremblay, Suzanne | Bloc Québécois | Rimouski-Neigette-et-la Mitis | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Turp, Daniel | Bloc Québécois | Beauharnois—Salaberry | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.