Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 13 of 13
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rajotte, James | Conservative | Edmonton—Leduc | Alberta | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Ratansi, Yasmin | Liberal | Don Valley East | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Redman, Hon. Karen | Liberal | Kitchener Centre | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Regan, Hon. Geoff | Liberal | Halifax West | Nova Scotia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Reid, Scott | Conservative | Lanark—Frontenac—Lennox and Addington | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Reynolds, Hon. John | Conservative | West Vancouver—Sunshine Coast—Sea to Sky Country | British Columbia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Richardson, Lee | Conservative | Calgary Centre | Alberta | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Ritz, Hon. Gerry | Conservative | Battlefords—Lloydminster | Saskatchewan | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Robillard, Hon. Lucienne | Liberal | Westmount—Ville-Marie | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Rodriguez, Pablo | Liberal | Honoré-Mercier | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Rota, Anthony | Liberal | Nipissing—Timiskaming | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Roy, Jean-Yves | Bloc Québécois | Haute-Gaspésie—La Mitis—Matane—Matapédia | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Russell, Todd Norman | Liberal | Labrador | Newfoundland and Labrador | Tuesday, May 24, 2005 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.