Members of the 36th Parliament
(Monday, September 22, 1997 to Sunday, October 22, 2000)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 4 of 4
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
O'Brien, Lawrence | Liberal | Labrador | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
O'Brien, Pat | Liberal | London—Fanshawe | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
O'Reilly, John | Liberal | Haliburton—Victoria—Brock | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Obhrai, Deepak | Canadian Alliance | Calgary East | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.