Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 35 of 35
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
MacAulay, Hon. Lawrence | Liberal | Cardigan | Prince Edward Island | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
MacKay, Hon. Peter Gordon | Conservative | Central Nova | Nova Scotia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
MacKenzie, Dave | Conservative | Oxford | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Macklin, Hon. Paul Harold | Liberal | Northumberland—Quinte West | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Malhi, Hon. Gurbax S. | Liberal | Bramalea—Gore—Malton | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Maloney, John | Liberal | Welland | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Marceau, Richard | Bloc Québécois | Charlesbourg—Haute-Saint-Charles | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Mark, Inky | Conservative | Dauphin—Swan River—Marquette | Manitoba | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Marleau, Hon. Diane | Liberal | Sudbury | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Martin, Hon. Keith | Liberal | Esquimalt—Juan de Fuca | British Columbia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Martin, Pat | NDP | Winnipeg Centre | Manitoba | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Martin, Right Hon. Paul | Liberal | LaSalle—Émard | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Martin, Tony | NDP | Sault Ste. Marie | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Masse, Brian | NDP | Windsor West | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Matthews, Bill | Liberal | Random—Burin—St. George's | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
McCallum, Hon. John | Liberal | Markham—Unionville | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
McDonough, Alexa | NDP | Halifax | Nova Scotia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
McGuinty, David J. | Liberal | Ottawa South | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
McGuire, Hon. Joe | Liberal | Egmont | Prince Edward Island | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
McKay, Hon. John | Liberal | Scarborough—Guildwood | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
McLellan, Hon. Anne | Liberal | Edmonton Centre | Alberta | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
McTeague, Hon. Dan | Liberal | Pickering—Scarborough East | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Ménard, Réal | Bloc Québécois | Hochelaga | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Ménard, Serge | Bloc Québécois | Marc-Aurèle-Fortin | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Menzies, Hon. Ted | Conservative | Macleod | Alberta | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Merrifield, Hon. Rob | Conservative | Yellowhead | Alberta | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Miller, Larry | Conservative | Bruce—Grey—Owen Sound | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Milliken, Hon. Peter | Liberal | Kingston and the Islands | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Mills, Bob | Conservative | Red Deer | Alberta | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Minna, Hon. Maria | Liberal | Beaches—East York | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Mitchell, Hon. Andy | Liberal | Parry Sound—Muskoka | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Moore, Hon. James | Conservative | Port Moody—Westwood—Port Coquitlam | British Columbia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Moore, Hon. Rob | Conservative | Fundy Royal | New Brunswick | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Murphy, Hon. Shawn | Liberal | Charlottetown | Prince Edward Island | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Myers, Lynn | Liberal | Kitchener—Conestoga | Ontario | Thursday, February 24, 2005 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.