Members of the 37th Parliament
(Monday, January 29, 2001 to Sunday, May 23, 2004)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 37 of 37
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
MacAulay, Hon. Lawrence | Liberal | Cardigan | Prince Edward Island | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
MacKay, Hon. Peter Gordon | Conservative | Pictou—Antigonish—Guysborough | Nova Scotia | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Macklin, Hon. Paul Harold | Liberal | Northumberland | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Mahoney, Hon. Steve | Liberal | Mississauga West | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Malhi, Hon. Gurbax S. | Liberal | Bramalea—Gore—Malton—Springdale | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Maloney, John | Liberal | Erie—Lincoln | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Manley, Hon. John | Liberal | Ottawa South | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Manning, Preston | Canadian Alliance | Calgary Southwest | Alberta | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Thursday, January 31, 2002 |
Marceau, Richard | Bloc Québécois | Charlesbourg—Jacques-Cartier | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Marcil, Hon. Serge | Liberal | Beauharnois—Salaberry | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Mark, Inky | Conservative | Dauphin—Swan River | Manitoba | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Marleau, Hon. Diane | Liberal | Sudbury | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Martin, Hon. Keith | Independent | Esquimalt—Juan de Fuca | British Columbia | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Martin, Pat | NDP | Winnipeg Centre | Manitoba | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Martin, Right Hon. Paul | Liberal | LaSalle—Émard | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Masse, Brian | NDP | Windsor West | Ontario | Monday, May 13, 2002 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Matthews, Bill | Liberal | Burin—St. George's | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Mayfield, Philip | Conservative | Cariboo—Chilcotin | British Columbia | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
McCallum, Hon. John | Liberal | Markham | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
McCormick, Larry | Liberal | Hastings—Frontenac—Lennox and Addington | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
McDonough, Alexa | NDP | Halifax | Nova Scotia | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
McGuire, Hon. Joe | Liberal | Egmont | Prince Edward Island | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
McKay, Hon. John | Liberal | Scarborough East | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
McLellan, Hon. Anne | Liberal | Edmonton West | Alberta | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
McNally, Grant | Conservative | Dewdney—Alouette | British Columbia | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
McTeague, Hon. Dan | Liberal | Pickering—Ajax—Uxbridge | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Ménard, Réal | Bloc Québécois | Hochelaga—Maisonneuve | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Meredith, Val | Conservative | South Surrey—White Rock—Langley | British Columbia | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Merrifield, Hon. Rob | Conservative | Yellowhead | Alberta | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Milliken, Hon. Peter | Liberal | Kingston and the Islands | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Mills, Bob | Conservative | Red Deer | Alberta | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Mills, Dennis | Liberal | Toronto—Danforth | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Minna, Hon. Maria | Liberal | Beaches—East York | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Mitchell, Hon. Andy | Liberal | Parry Sound—Muskoka | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Moore, Hon. James | Conservative | Port Moody—Coquitlam—Port Coquitlam | British Columbia | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Murphy, Hon. Shawn | Liberal | Hillsborough | Prince Edward Island | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Myers, Lynn | Liberal | Waterloo—Wellington | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.