Members of the 39th Parliament
(Monday, April 3, 2006 to Sunday, September 7, 2008)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 20 of 20
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laforest, Jean-Yves | Bloc Québécois | Saint-Maurice—Champlain | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Laframboise, Mario | Bloc Québécois | Argenteuil—Papineau—Mirabel | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Lake, Hon. Mike | Conservative | Edmonton—Mill Woods—Beaumont | Alberta | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Lalonde, Francine | Bloc Québécois | La Pointe-de-l'Île | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Lapierre, Hon. Jean C. | Liberal | Outremont | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Sunday, January 28, 2007 |
Lauzon, Guy | Conservative | Stormont—Dundas—South Glengarry | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Lavallée, Carole | Bloc Québécois | Saint-Bruno—Saint-Hubert | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Layton, Hon. Jack | NDP | Toronto—Danforth | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Lebel, Hon. Denis | Conservative | Roberval—Lac-Saint-Jean | Quebec | Monday, September 17, 2007 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
LeBlanc, Hon. Dominic | Liberal | Beauséjour | New Brunswick | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Lee, Derek | Liberal | Scarborough—Rouge River | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Lemay, Marc | Bloc Québécois | Abitibi—Témiscamingue | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Lemieux, Pierre | Conservative | Glengarry—Prescott—Russell | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Lessard, Yves | Bloc Québécois | Chambly—Borduas | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Lévesque, Yvon | Bloc Québécois | Abitibi—Baie-James—Nunavik—Eeyou | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Loubier, Yvan | Bloc Québécois | Saint-Hyacinthe—Bagot | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Wednesday, February 21, 2007 |
Lukiwski, Tom | Conservative | Regina—Lumsden—Lake Centre | Saskatchewan | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Lunn, Hon. Gary | Conservative | Saanich—Gulf Islands | British Columbia | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Lunney, James | Conservative | Nanaimo—Alberni | British Columbia | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Lussier, Marcel | Bloc Québécois | Brossard—La Prairie | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.