Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 18 of 18
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laframboise, Mario | Bloc Québécois | Argenteuil—Papineau—Mirabel | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Lalonde, Francine | Bloc Québécois | La Pointe-de-l'Île | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Lapierre, Hon. Jean C. | Liberal | Outremont | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Lapierre, Réal | Bloc Québécois | Lévis—Bellechasse | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Lastewka, Hon. Walt | Liberal | St. Catharines | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Lauzon, Guy | Conservative | Stormont—Dundas—South Glengarry | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Lavallée, Carole | Bloc Québécois | Saint-Bruno—Saint-Hubert | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Layton, Hon. Jack | NDP | Toronto—Danforth | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
LeBlanc, Hon. Dominic | Liberal | Beauséjour | New Brunswick | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Lee, Derek | Liberal | Scarborough—Rouge River | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Lemay, Marc | Bloc Québécois | Abitibi—Témiscamingue | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Lessard, Yves | Bloc Québécois | Chambly—Borduas | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Lévesque, Yvon | Bloc Québécois | Abitibi—Baie-James—Nunavik—Eeyou | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Longfield, Hon. Judi | Liberal | Whitby—Oshawa | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Loubier, Yvan | Bloc Québécois | Saint-Hyacinthe—Bagot | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Lukiwski, Tom | Conservative | Regina—Lumsden—Lake Centre | Saskatchewan | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Lunn, Hon. Gary | Conservative | Saanich—Gulf Islands | British Columbia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Lunney, James | Conservative | Nanaimo—Alberni | British Columbia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.