Members of the 36th Parliament
(Monday, September 22, 1997 to Sunday, October 22, 2000)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 16 of 16
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laliberte, Rick | Liberal | Desnethé—Missinippi—Churchill River | Saskatchewan | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Lalonde, Francine | Bloc Québécois | Mercier | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Lastewka, Hon. Walt | Liberal | St. Catharines | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Laurin, René | Bloc Québécois | Joliette | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Lavigne, Hon. Raymond | Liberal | Verdun—Saint-Henri—Saint-Paul—Pointe Saint-Charles | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Lebel, Ghislain | Bloc Québécois | Chambly | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Lee, Derek | Liberal | Scarborough—Rouge River | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Lefebvre, Réjean | Independent | Champlain | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Leung, Sophia | Liberal | Vancouver Kingsway | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Lill, Wendy | NDP | Dartmouth | Nova Scotia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Limoges, Rick | Liberal | Windsor—St. Clair | Ontario | Monday, April 12, 1999 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Lincoln, Clifford | Liberal | Lac-Saint-Louis | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Longfield, Hon. Judi | Liberal | Whitby—Ajax | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Loubier, Yvan | Bloc Québécois | Saint-Hyacinthe—Bagot | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Lowther, Eric | Canadian Alliance | Calgary Centre | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Lunn, Hon. Gary | Canadian Alliance | Saanich—Gulf Islands | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.