Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 14 of 14
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harper, Right Hon. Stephen | Conservative | Calgary Southwest | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Harris, Dan | NDP | Scarborough Southwest | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Harris, Jack | NDP | St. John's East | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Harris, Richard M. | Conservative | Cariboo—Prince George | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Hassainia, Sana | Independent | Verchères—Les Patriotes | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Hawn, Hon. Laurie | Conservative | Edmonton Centre | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Hayes, Bryan | Conservative | Sault Ste. Marie | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Hiebert, Russ | Conservative | South Surrey—White Rock—Cloverdale | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Hillyer, Jim | Conservative | Lethbridge | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Hoback, Randy | Conservative | Prince Albert | Saskatchewan | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Holder, Hon. Ed | Conservative | London West | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Hsu, Ted | Liberal | Kingston and the Islands | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Hughes, Carol | NDP | Algoma—Manitoulin—Kapuskasing | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Hyer, Bruce | Green Party | Thunder Bay—Superior North | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.