Members of the 36th Parliament
(Monday, September 22, 1997 to Sunday, October 22, 2000)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 21 of 21
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gagliano, Hon. Alfonso L. | Liberal | Saint-Léonard—Saint-Michel | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Gagnon, Christiane | Bloc Québécois | Québec | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Gallaway, Hon. Roger | Liberal | Sarnia—Lambton | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Gauthier, Michel | Bloc Québécois | Roberval | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Gilmour, Bill | Canadian Alliance | Nanaimo—Alberni | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Girard-Bujold, Jocelyne | Bloc Québécois | Jonquière | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Godfrey, Hon. John | Liberal | Don Valley West | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Godin, Maurice | Bloc Québécois | Châteauguay | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Godin, Yvon | NDP | Acadie—Bathurst | New Brunswick | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Goldring, Peter | Canadian Alliance | Edmonton Centre-East | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Goodale, Hon. Ralph | Liberal | Wascana | Saskatchewan | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Gouk, Jim | Canadian Alliance | Kootenay—Boundary—Okanagan | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Graham, Bill | Liberal | Toronto Centre—Rosedale | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Gray, Rt. Hon Herb | Liberal | Windsor West | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Grewal, Gurmant | Canadian Alliance | Surrey Central | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Grey, Deborah | Canadian Alliance | Edmonton North | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Grose, Ivan | Liberal | Oshawa | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Gruending, Dennis | NDP | Saskatoon—Rosetown—Biggar | Saskatchewan | Monday, November 15, 1999 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Guarnieri, Hon. Albina | Liberal | Mississauga East | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Guay, Monique | Bloc Québécois | Laurentides | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Guimond, Michel | Bloc Québécois | Beauport—Montmorency—Côte-de-Beaupré—Île-d'Orléans | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.