Members of the 36th Parliament
(Monday, September 22, 1997 to Sunday, October 22, 2000)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 7 of 7
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Finestone, Hon. Sheila | Liberal | Mount Royal | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Tuesday, August 10, 1999 |
Finlay, John | Liberal | Oxford | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Folco, Raymonde | Liberal | Laval West | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Fontana, Hon. Joe | Liberal | London North Centre | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Forseth, Paul | Canadian Alliance | New Westminster—Coquitlam—Burnaby | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Fournier, Ghislain | Bloc Québécois | Manicouagan | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Fry, Hon. Hedy | Liberal | Vancouver Centre | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.