Members of the 42nd Parliament
(Thursday, December 3, 2015 to Wednesday, September 11, 2019)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 8 of 8
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Easter, Hon. Wayne | Liberal | Malpeque | Prince Edward Island | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Eglinski, Jim | Conservative | Yellowhead | Alberta | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Ehsassi, Ali | Liberal | Willowdale | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
El-Khoury, Fayçal | Liberal | Laval—Les Îles | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Ellis, Neil R. | Liberal | Bay of Quinte | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Erskine-Smith, Nathaniel | Liberal | Beaches—East York | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Eyking, Hon. Mark | Liberal | Sydney—Victoria | Nova Scotia | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Eyolfson, Doug | Liberal | Charleswood—St. James—Assiniboia—Headingley | Manitoba | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.