Members of the 40th Parliament
(Tuesday, November 18, 2008 to Saturday, March 26, 2011)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 27 of 27
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
D'Amours, Jean-Claude | Liberal | Madawaska—Restigouche | New Brunswick | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Davidson, Patricia | Conservative | Sarnia—Lambton | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Davies, Don | NDP | Vancouver Kingsway | British Columbia | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Davies, Libby | NDP | Vancouver East | British Columbia | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Day, Hon. Stockwell | Conservative | Okanagan—Coquihalla | British Columbia | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
DeBellefeuille, Claude | Bloc Québécois | Beauharnois—Salaberry | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Dechert, Bob | Conservative | Mississauga—Erindale | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Del Mastro, Dean | Conservative | Peterborough | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Demers, Nicole | Bloc Québécois | Laval | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Deschamps, Johanne | Bloc Québécois | Laurentides—Labelle | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Desnoyers, Luc | Bloc Québécois | Rivière-des-Mille-Îles | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Devolin, Barry | Conservative | Haliburton—Kawartha Lakes—Brock | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Dewar, Paul | NDP | Ottawa Centre | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Dhaliwal, Sukh | Liberal | Newton—North Delta | British Columbia | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Dhalla, Ruby | Liberal | Brampton—Springdale | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Dion, Hon. Stéphane | Liberal | Saint-Laurent—Cartierville | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Donnelly, Fin | NDP | New Westminster—Coquitlam | British Columbia | Monday, November 9, 2009 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Dorion, Jean | Bloc Québécois | Longueuil—Pierre-Boucher | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Dosanjh, Hon. Ujjal | Liberal | Vancouver South | British Columbia | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Dreeshen, Earl | Conservative | Red Deer | Alberta | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Dryden, Hon. Ken | Liberal | York Centre | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Duceppe, Gilles | Bloc Québécois | Laurier—Sainte-Marie | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Dufour, Nicolas | Bloc Québécois | Repentigny | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Duncan, Hon. John | Conservative | Vancouver Island North | British Columbia | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Duncan, Hon. Kirsty | Liberal | Etobicoke North | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Duncan, Linda | NDP | Edmonton—Strathcona | Alberta | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Dykstra, Rick | Conservative | St. Catharines | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.