Members of the 39th Parliament
(Monday, April 3, 2006 to Sunday, September 7, 2008)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 18 of 18
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
D'Amours, Jean-Claude | Liberal | Madawaska—Restigouche | New Brunswick | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Davidson, Patricia | Conservative | Sarnia—Lambton | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Davies, Libby | NDP | Vancouver East | British Columbia | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Day, Hon. Stockwell | Conservative | Okanagan—Coquihalla | British Columbia | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
DeBellefeuille, Claude | Bloc Québécois | Beauharnois—Salaberry | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Del Mastro, Dean | Conservative | Peterborough | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Demers, Nicole | Bloc Québécois | Laval | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Deschamps, Johanne | Bloc Québécois | Laurentides—Labelle | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Devolin, Barry | Conservative | Haliburton—Kawartha Lakes—Brock | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Dewar, Paul | NDP | Ottawa Centre | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Dhaliwal, Sukh | Liberal | Newton—North Delta | British Columbia | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Dhalla, Ruby | Liberal | Brampton—Springdale | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Dion, Hon. Stéphane | Liberal | Saint-Laurent—Cartierville | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Dosanjh, Hon. Ujjal | Liberal | Vancouver South | British Columbia | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Doyle, Hon. Norman E. | Conservative | St. John's East | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Dryden, Hon. Ken | Liberal | York Centre | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Duceppe, Gilles | Bloc Québécois | Laurier—Sainte-Marie | Quebec | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Dykstra, Rick | Conservative | St. Catharines | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.