Members of the 36th Parliament
(Monday, September 22, 1997 to Sunday, October 22, 2000)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 21 of 21
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dalphond-Guiral, Madeleine | Bloc Québécois | Laval Centre | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Davies, Libby | NDP | Vancouver East | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Day, Hon. Stockwell | Canadian Alliance | Okanagan—Coquihalla | British Columbia | Monday, September 11, 2000 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
de Savoye, Pierre | Bloc Québécois | Portneuf | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Debien, Maud | Bloc Québécois | Laval East | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Desjarlais, Bev | NDP | Churchill | Manitoba | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Desrochers, Odina | Bloc Québécois | Lotbinière—L'Érable | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
DeVillers, Paul | Liberal | Simcoe North | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Dhaliwal, Hon. Herb | Liberal | Vancouver South—Burnaby | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Dion, Hon. Stéphane | Liberal | Saint-Laurent—Cartierville | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Discepola, Nick | Liberal | Vaudreuil—Soulanges | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Dockrill, Michelle | NDP | Bras d'Or—Cape Breton | Nova Scotia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Doyle, Hon. Norman E. | PC | St. John's East | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Dromisky, Stan | Liberal | Thunder Bay—Atikokan | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Drouin, Claude | Liberal | Beauce | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Dubé, Antoine | Bloc Québécois | Lévis-et-Chutes-de-la-Chaudière | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Dubé, Jean | PC | Madawaska—Restigouche | New Brunswick | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Duceppe, Gilles | Bloc Québécois | Laurier—Sainte-Marie | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Duhamel, Hon. Ronald | Liberal | Saint Boniface | Manitoba | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Dumas, Maurice | Bloc Québécois | Argenteuil—Papineau—Mirabel | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Duncan, Hon. John | Canadian Alliance | Vancouver Island North | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.