Members of the 40th Parliament
(Tuesday, November 18, 2008 to Saturday, March 26, 2011)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 27 of 27
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cadman, Dona | Conservative | Surrey North | British Columbia | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Calandra, Paul | Conservative | Oak Ridges—Markham | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Calkins, Blaine | Conservative | Wetaskiwin | Alberta | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Cannan, Hon. Ron | Conservative | Kelowna—Lake Country | British Columbia | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Cannis, John | Liberal | Scarborough Centre | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Cannon, Hon. Lawrence | Conservative | Pontiac | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Cardin, Serge | Bloc Québécois | Sherbrooke | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Carrie, Colin | Conservative | Oshawa | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Carrier, Robert | Bloc Québécois | Alfred-Pellan | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Casey, Bill | Independent | Cumberland—Colchester—Musquodoboit Valley | Nova Scotia | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Thursday, April 30, 2009 |
Casson, Hon. Rick | Conservative | Lethbridge | Alberta | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Charlton, Chris | NDP | Hamilton Mountain | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Chong, Hon. Michael D. | Conservative | Wellington—Halton Hills | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Chow, Olivia | NDP | Trinity—Spadina | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Christopherson, David | NDP | Hamilton Centre | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Clarke, Rob | Conservative | Desnethé—Missinippi—Churchill River | Saskatchewan | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Clement, Hon. Tony | Conservative | Parry Sound—Muskoka | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Coady, Siobhan | Liberal | St. John's South—Mount Pearl | Newfoundland and Labrador | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Coderre, Hon. Denis | Liberal | Bourassa | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Comartin, Joe | NDP | Windsor—Tecumseh | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Cotler, Hon. Irwin | Liberal | Mount Royal | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Crête, Paul | Bloc Québécois | Montmagny—L'Islet—Kamouraska—Rivière-du-Loup | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Thursday, May 21, 2009 |
Crombie, Bonnie | Liberal | Mississauga—Streetsville | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Crowder, Jean | NDP | Nanaimo—Cowichan | British Columbia | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Cullen, Nathan | NDP | Skeena—Bulkley Valley | British Columbia | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Cummins, John | Conservative | Delta—Richmond East | British Columbia | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Cuzner, Rodger | Liberal | Cape Breton—Canso | Nova Scotia | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.