Members of the 36th Parliament
(Monday, September 22, 1997 to Sunday, October 22, 2000)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 30 of 30
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caccia, Hon. Charles L. | Liberal | Davenport | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Cadman, Chuck | Canadian Alliance | Surrey North | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Calder, Murray | Liberal | Dufferin—Peel—Wellington—Grey | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Cannis, John | Liberal | Scarborough Centre | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Canuel, René | Bloc Québécois | Matapédia—Matane | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Caplan, Hon. Elinor | Liberal | Thornhill | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Cardin, Serge | Bloc Québécois | Sherbrooke | Quebec | Monday, September 14, 1998 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Carroll, Hon. Aileen | Liberal | Barrie—Simcoe—Bradford | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Casey, Bill | PC | Cumberland—Colchester | Nova Scotia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Casson, Hon. Rick | Canadian Alliance | Lethbridge | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Catterall, Marlene | Ottawa West—Nepean | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 | |
Cauchon, Hon. Martin | Liberal | Outremont | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Chamberlain, Hon. Brenda | Liberal | Guelph—Wellington | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Chan, Hon. Raymond | Liberal | Richmond | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Charbonneau, Hon. Yvon | Liberal | Anjou—Rivière-des-Prairies | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Charest, Hon. Jean J. | PC | Sherbrooke | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Friday, May 1, 1998 |
Chatters, David | Canadian Alliance | Athabasca | Alberta | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Chrétien, Right Hon. Jean | Liberal | Saint-Maurice | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Chrétien, Jean-Guy | Bloc Québécois | Frontenac—Mégantic | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Clark, Right Hon. Joe | PC | Kings—Hants | Nova Scotia | Monday, September 11, 2000 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Clouthier, Hec | Liberal | Renfrew—Nipissing—Pembroke | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Coderre, Hon. Denis | Liberal | Bourassa | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Cohen, Shaughnessy | Liberal | Windsor—St. Clair | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Wednesday, December 9, 1998 |
Collenette, Hon. David | Liberal | Don Valley East | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Comuzzi, Hon. Joe | Liberal | Thunder Bay—Superior North | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Copps, Hon. Sheila | Liberal | Hamilton East | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Cotler, Hon. Irwin | Liberal | Mount Royal | Quebec | Monday, November 15, 1999 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Crête, Paul | Bloc Québécois | Kamouraska—Rivière-du-Loup—Témiscouata—Les Basques | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Cullen, Hon. Roy | Liberal | Etobicoke North | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Cummins, John | Canadian Alliance | Delta—South Richmond | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.