Members of the 40th Parliament
(Tuesday, November 18, 2008 to Saturday, March 26, 2011)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 33 of 33
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bachand, Claude | Bloc Québécois | Saint-Jean | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Bagnell, Hon. Larry | Liberal | Yukon | Yukon | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Bains, Hon. Navdeep | Liberal | Mississauga—Brampton South | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Baird, Hon. John | Conservative | Ottawa West—Nepean | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Beaudin, Josée | Bloc Québécois | Saint-Lambert | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Bélanger, Hon. Mauril | Liberal | Ottawa—Vanier | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Bellavance, André | Bloc Québécois | Richmond—Arthabaska | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Bennett, Hon. Carolyn | Liberal | St. Paul's | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Benoit, Leon | Conservative | Vegreville—Wainwright | Alberta | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Bernier, Hon. Maxime | Conservative | Beauce | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Bevilacqua, Hon. Maurizio | Liberal | Vaughan | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Thursday, September 2, 2010 |
Bevington, Dennis | NDP | Western Arctic | Northwest Territories | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Bezan, James | Conservative | Selkirk—Interlake | Manitoba | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Bigras, Bernard | Bloc Québécois | Rosemont—La Petite-Patrie | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Black, Dawn | NDP | New Westminster—Coquitlam | British Columbia | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Monday, April 13, 2009 |
Blackburn, Hon. Jean-Pierre | Conservative | Jonquière—Alma | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Blais, Raynald | Bloc Québécois | Gaspésie—Îles-de-la-Madeleine | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Blaney, Hon. Steven | Conservative | Lévis—Bellechasse | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Block, Kelly | Conservative | Saskatoon—Rosetown—Biggar | Saskatchewan | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Bonsant, France | Bloc Québécois | Compton—Stanstead | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Bouchard, Robert | Bloc Québécois | Chicoutimi—Le Fjord | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Boucher, Sylvie | Conservative | Beauport—Limoilou | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Boughen, Ray | Conservative | Palliser | Saskatchewan | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Bourgeois, Diane | Bloc Québécois | Terrebonne—Blainville | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Braid, Peter | Conservative | Kitchener—Waterloo | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Breitkreuz, Garry | Conservative | Yorkton—Melville | Saskatchewan | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Brison, Hon. Scott | Liberal | Kings—Hants | Nova Scotia | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Brown, Gordon | Conservative | Leeds—Grenville | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Brown, Lois | Conservative | Newmarket—Aurora | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Brown, Patrick | Conservative | Barrie | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Bruinooge, Rod | Conservative | Winnipeg South | Manitoba | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Brunelle, Paule | Bloc Québécois | Trois-Rivières | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Byrne, Hon. Gerry | Liberal | Humber—St. Barbe—Baie Verte | Newfoundland and Labrador | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.