Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 37 of 37
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bachand, Claude | Bloc Québécois | Saint-Jean | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Bagnell, Hon. Larry | Liberal | Yukon | Yukon | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Bains, Hon. Navdeep | Liberal | Mississauga—Brampton South | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Bakopanos, Hon. Eleni | Liberal | Ahuntsic | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Barnes, Hon. Sue | Liberal | London West | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Batters, Dave | Conservative | Palliser | Saskatchewan | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Beaumier, Colleen | Liberal | Brampton West | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Bélanger, Hon. Mauril | Liberal | Ottawa—Vanier | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Bell, Don H. | Liberal | North Vancouver | British Columbia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Bellavance, André | Bloc Québécois | Richmond—Arthabaska | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Bennett, Hon. Carolyn | Liberal | St. Paul's | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Benoit, Leon | Conservative | Vegreville—Wainwright | Alberta | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Bergeron, Stéphane | Bloc Québécois | Verchères—Les Patriotes | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Wednesday, November 9, 2005 |
Bevilacqua, Hon. Maurizio | Liberal | Vaughan | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Bezan, James | Conservative | Selkirk—Interlake | Manitoba | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Bigras, Bernard | Bloc Québécois | Rosemont—La Petite-Patrie | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Blaikie, Hon. Bill | NDP | Elmwood—Transcona | Manitoba | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Blais, Raynald | Bloc Québécois | Gaspésie—Îles-de-la-Madeleine | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Blondin-Andrew, Hon. Ethel | Liberal | Western Arctic | Northwest Territories | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Boire, Alain | Bloc Québécois | Beauharnois—Salaberry | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Boivin, Françoise | Liberal | Gatineau | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Bonin, Raymond | Liberal | Nickel Belt | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Bonsant, France | Bloc Québécois | Compton—Stanstead | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Boshcoff, Ken | Liberal | Thunder Bay—Rainy River | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Bouchard, Robert | Bloc Québécois | Chicoutimi—Le Fjord | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Boudria, Hon. Don | Liberal | Glengarry—Prescott—Russell | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Boulianne, Marc | Bloc Québécois | Mégantic—L'Érable | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Bourgeois, Diane | Bloc Québécois | Terrebonne—Blainville | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Bradshaw, Hon. Claudette | Liberal | Moncton—Riverview—Dieppe | New Brunswick | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Breitkreuz, Garry | Conservative | Yorkton—Melville | Saskatchewan | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Brison, Hon. Scott | Liberal | Kings—Hants | Nova Scotia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Broadbent, Hon. Ed | NDP | Ottawa Centre | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Brown, Bonnie | Liberal | Oakville | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Brown, Gordon | Conservative | Leeds—Grenville | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Brunelle, Paule | Bloc Québécois | Trois-Rivières | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Bulte, Hon. Sarmite | Liberal | Parkdale—High Park | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Byrne, Hon. Gerry | Liberal | Humber—St. Barbe—Baie Verte | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.